Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case in the jurisdiction of Citrus County. This case was filed in Citrus County Superior Courts with FALVEY, CAROL A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFALVEY, CAROL A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 16, 2021 |
CategoryEminent Domain Main |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCitrus County, FL |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: January 29, 2022ORDER ON MOTION FOR PAYMENT OF TAXES TO THE TAX COLLECTOR
Date: June 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
January 29, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY JANICE A WARREN CITRUS COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR E - Recorded (OR.3249.1681. / 2022007361) | |
January 29, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT E - Recorded (OR.3195.698. / 2021055827) | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER ON MOTION FOR PAYMENT OF TAXES TO THE TAX COLLECTOR | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER/JUDGMENT EFILED UNEXECUTED | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSIT | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $80,000.00 RECEIPT #2021022301 | |
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR PAYMENT OF TAXES TO THE TAX COLLECTOR | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED STIPULATED ORDER OF TAKING (WITH DIRECTIONS TO CLERK) - E - RECORDED (OR.3170.1858. / 2021037158) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.