Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Citrus County. This case was filed in Citrus County Superior Courts with FALVEY, CAROL A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFALVEY, CAROL A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 14, 2021 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCitrus County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by Russell Jackowitz against Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company. The jurisdiction of this case falls under the Fifth Judicial Circuit in Citrus County, Florida. The plaintiff alleges that they entered into an insur...
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF PROCESS
Date: April 27, 2021DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVING UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND SET OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: September 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION | |
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION | |
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFENDANTS DESIGNATED CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1.310 (B)(6) | |
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFENDANTS FIELD ADJUSTER | |
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFENDANT'S CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE | |
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION | |
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFENDANTS CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.