Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) General Property - Property case in the jurisdiction of Citrus County. This case was filed in Citrus County Superior Courts with FALVEY, CAROL A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFALVEY, CAROL A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 13, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property <50000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCitrus County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE
Date: April 13, 2021COVER SHEET
Date: April 13, 2021MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE
Date: April 27, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT E - Recorded (OR.3185.221. / 2021048121) | |
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | REOPENED CASE CLOSED | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER TO VACATE JUDGMENT AND AMEND COMPLAINT E - Recorded (OR.3181.1810. / 2021045540) | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT DATED MAY 3 2021 AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE REOPENED FOR REOPEN | |
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT E - Recorded (OR.3162.791. / 2021030381) | |
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE | |
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event | COPY OF COURTS ORDER DATED MARCH 15 2021 IN CASE NO. 2020-CA-0504 - NOTICE OF FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.