Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) General Property - Property case in the jurisdiction of Citrus County. This case was filed in Citrus County Superior Courts with FALVEY, CAROL A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFALVEY, CAROL A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 13, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property <50000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCitrus County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
COVER SHEET
Date: April 13, 2021COPY OF ORDER DATED MARCH 15 2021 IN CASE NO. 2020-CA-504 - NOTICE OF FILING
Date: April 27, 2021MOTION FOR FINAL FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE
Date: April 27, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT E - Recorded (OR.3170.1203. / 2021036954) | |
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER DATED MARCH 15 2021 TO CASE 2020CA504 - AMENDED NOTICE OF FILING | |
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event | COPY OF ORDER DATED MARCH 15 2021 IN CASE NO. 2020-CA-504 - NOTICE OF FILING | |
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE | |
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2021014773 | |
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGE FALVEY, CAROL A: ASSIGNED | |
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: MUTARELLI, RICHARD DAVID JR ASSIGNED | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.