Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Citrus County. This case was filed in Citrus County Superior Courts with FALVEY, CAROL A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFALVEY, CAROL A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2021 |
CategoryNon-Homestead Fc >50 <249 |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCitrus County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
SUMMONS ISSUED - CIVIL
Date: January 14, 2021COVER SHEET
Date: January 14, 2021PAYMENT $977.50 RECEIPT #2021001780
Date: January 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND CANCELLATION OF LIS PENDENS E - Recorded (OR.3139.1354. / 2021012913) | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE-SERVED | |
February 15, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFENDANT STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE E - Recorded (OR.3135.2464. / 2021010102) | |
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | CONDITIONAL DISCLAIMER OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH 28 USC �2410 | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED - CIVIL | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $977.50 RECEIPT #2021001780 | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY ON MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.