Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case in the jurisdiction of Citrus County. This case was filed in Citrus County Superior Courts with FALVEY, CAROL A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFALVEY, CAROL A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2021 |
CategoryOther-Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationCitrus County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by Samuel McMechan and Judith McMechan against Tower Hill Prime Insurance Company. The plaintiffs allege that they owned a property located at 870 N Indianapolis Ave., Hernando, FL 34442, which was covered by a policy issued b...
COVER SHEET
Date: January 04, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED - CIVIL
Date: January 04, 2021PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT
Date: January 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE E - Recorded (OR.3195.2057. / 2021056284) | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM | |
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD WITHIN FIRM AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS | |
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE PER FLA R CIV P 1.310(B)(6) | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLAINTIFF | |
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM | |
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE PER FLA R CIV P 1.310(B)(6) | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANTS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DONALD FELDSINE | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.