Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Citrus County. This case was filed in Citrus County Superior Courts with YOUMANS, STACY M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeYOUMANS, STACY M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2020 |
CategoryFormal |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationCitrus County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISCHARGE- E - Recorded (OR.3188.1364. / 2021050804) | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGE FRITTON, JOEL D: ASSIGNED | |
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE - WENDY | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | STATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | REPORT OF DISTRIBUTION | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL ACCOUNTING OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISCHARGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.