Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Tynes, Christopher Alexander, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Buschmann, Paul, Leonard, Jason R, Rezapour, Lara Weems, against Door Dash, Inc., Errasti, Daymara Cardenas, represented by Buschmann, Paul, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with GENTILE, GEOFFREY H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGENTILE, GEOFFREY H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 18, 2023 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANTDOOR DASH, INC
Date: March 18, 2023REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANTDAYMARA CARDENAS ERRASTI
Date: March 18, 2023CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 18, 2023INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 18, 2023NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: March 18, 2023LETTER FROM CLERK TO ATTORNEY
Date: March 20, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: March 18, 2023STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES
Date: March 18, 2023SUMMONS REQUEST - CANNOT ISSUE
Date: March 18, 2023REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANTDOOR DASH, INC
Date: March 18, 2023NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 18, 2023REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT DAYMARA CARDENAS ERRASTI
Date: March 18, 20239/8/2023
Date: April 03, 20249/28/2023
Date: April 02, 20247/19/2023
Date: April 05, 20249/14/2023
Date: April 02, 20248/14/2023
Date: April 02, 20249/8/2023
Date: April 04, 20248/9/2023
Date: April 01, 20248/8/2023
Date: April 02, 20247/13/2023
Date: April 07, 20247/11/2023
Date: April 04, 20247/11/2023
Date: April 02, 20247/11/2023
Date: April 10, 20247/12/2023
Date: April 02, 20246/29/2023
Date: April 01, 20246/15/2023
Date: April 01, 20246/15/2023
Date: April 04, 20243/18/2023
Date: April 05, 20243/20/2023
Date: April 01, 20243/18/2023
Date: April 04, 20243/18/2023
Date: April 07, 20243/18/2023
Date: April 02, 20243/18/2023
Date: April 03, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.