Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Rice, Diana, Wilson, George, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Ogonowski, Edward, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with GENTILE, GEOFFREY H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGENTILE, GEOFFREY H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 18, 2023 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
This complaint is filed by Diana Rice and George Wilson against Edward Ogonowski in the Circuit Court of the 20th Judicial Circuit in Charlotte County, Florida. The complaint alleges that on or about January 24, 2023, Edward Ogonowski negligently ope...
PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2023018724
Date: March 20, 2023STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES
Date: March 18, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: March 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2023018724 | |
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 03/20/2023 CASE NUMBER 23000621CA | |
March 18, 2023 | Docket Event | STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES | |
March 18, 2023 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.