Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bautista Vasquez, Zacarias, Vargas Santos, Erick J, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Usaa Casualty Insurance Company, Wilber, Alan J, represented by Oshiro, Tiffany T, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with GENTILE, GEOFFREY H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGENTILE, GEOFFREY H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 20, 2023 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 20, 2023PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2023018664
Date: March 20, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: March 20, 2023STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES
Date: March 20, 20238/11/2023
Date: April 01, 20247/26/2023
Date: April 01, 20247/31/2023
Date: April 02, 20247/31/2023
Date: April 03, 20247/31/2023
Date: April 04, 20247/21/2023
Date: April 01, 20247/11/2023
Date: April 09, 20246/27/2023
Date: April 01, 20247/17/2023
Date: April 02, 20246/27/2023
Date: April 03, 20246/27/2023
Date: April 02, 20243/20/2023
Date: April 05, 20243/20/2023
Date: April 01, 20243/20/2023
Date: April 02, 20243/20/2023
Date: April 03, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.