Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Wig, Mary, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Marin, Sara Katherine, against Target Corporation, represented by Kirollos, Yasmine, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with GENTILE, GEOFFREY H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGENTILE, GEOFFREY H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 19, 2023 |
CategoryPremises Liability - Commercial |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: March 19, 2023STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES
Date: March 19, 2023PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2023018633
Date: March 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2055 | Docket Event | ||
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.