Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Lacno, Travis, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Lambert, Lynda, represented by Gubernat, Jesse, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with GENTILE, GEOFFREY H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGENTILE, GEOFFREY H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 19, 2023 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedMarch 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
WITNESS LIST - PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST
Date: March 05, 2024DEFENDANT;S RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: January 12, 2024PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF IMPEACHMENT MATERIALS TO BE USED AT TRIAL
Date: February 15, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.