Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Boshears, Gabrielle, Suarez, Veronica, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Moon, James E, against Hale, Robert Howard, represented by Parker, Dale L, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with GENTILE, GEOFFREY H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGENTILE, GEOFFREY H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 19, 2023 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedMarch 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: September 12, 2023NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - ROBERT HOWARD HALE - NOVEMBER 14, 2023 @ 9:00 A.M.
Date: November 03, 2023DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, VERONICA SUAREZ
Date: July 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - RECORDED (OTHER.0.0. / 3382347) | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.