Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Richardson, Nathan, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Morrison, Brian K Esquire, against Aldridge, Savannah T, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with GENTILE, GEOFFREY H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGENTILE, GEOFFREY H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 18, 2023 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS REQUEST ISSUED SAVANNAH TAYLOR ALDRIDGE
Date: March 18, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: March 18, 2023PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2023018583
Date: March 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 17, 2064 | Docket Event | ||
April 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.