Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Bryant, Terrance, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Barroso, Isabel Diaz, Moon, James E, against Allstate Fire And Casualty Company, represented by Arend, Roland, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with GENTILE, GEOFFREY H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGENTILE, GEOFFREY H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 18, 2023 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedMarch 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
MOTION TO COMPEL - DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL BETTER RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY
Date: November 20, 2023MOTION FOR EXTENSION - ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: July 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF NON-BINDING ARBITRATION | |
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT LIST - | |
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL BETTER RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY | |
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY - SEE PLEADING FOR NAMES & TIME | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF - SUPPLEMENTAL UPDATED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT, ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S INTERROGATORIES | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | RESPONSE - DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE | |
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT LIST - |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.