Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Carroll, Finnoula, Carroll, Sean, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Norton, Richard, United Services Automobile Association, represented by Lankford Haynes, Lauren, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with GENTILE, GEOFFREY H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGENTILE, GEOFFREY H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 20, 112 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedMarch 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
COURT MINUTES
Date: March 26, 2024NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY - SEE PLEADING FOR NAMES & TIME
Date: November 06, 2023DEFENDANT'S CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION
Date: November 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2045 | Docket Event | ||
April 20, 2037 | Docket Event | ||
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.