Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mcdowall, Stephanie, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Cherichello, Thomas James, against Tedesco, Jimmy, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with GENTILE, GEOFFREY H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGENTILE, GEOFFREY H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 18, 2023 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023018572
Date: March 20, 2023SUMMONS CANNOT ISSUE
Date: March 18, 2023LETTER FROM CLERK TO ATTORNEY
Date: March 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023018572 | |
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM CLERK TO ATTORNEY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.