Case Last Refreshed: 4 weeks ago
Tegue, Gregory, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Agostino, Angela C, against Hornbuckle, Cindy, The Standard Fire Insurance Company, represented by Glasser, Amy L, Hill, Samuel, Lemongello, Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with GENTILE, GEOFFREY H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGENTILE, GEOFFREY H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 18, 2023 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedMarch 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: May 18, 2023NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION 1/4/24 @ 2:00PM
Date: December 05, 2023NOTICE OF SERVICE OF - COVERAGE INTERROGATORY
Date: August 23, 2023RE-NOTICE - (AI_TITLE} - GREGORY TEAGUE - 01/23/2024 @ 02:00 PM
Date: December 07, 2023ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL / NON - JURY TRIAL AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
Date: November 03, 2023MOTION - MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO PREVENT UNILATERALLY SCHEDULED DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF
Date: December 06, 2023CASE MANAGMENT PLAN AND ORDER
Date: September 07, 2023RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: July 13, 2023NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION
Date: May 10, 2023RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: June 14, 2023CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION
Date: December 28, 2023REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: May 22, 2023ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: May 10, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE - CINDY HORNBUCKLE - SERVED - 04/24/2023
Date: April 24, 2023REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: May 10, 2023NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: May 18, 2023NOTICE OF FILING - ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: July 13, 2023RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: July 19, 2023PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: April 17, 2023AMENDED DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: June 30, 2023PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: July 19, 2023REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT
Date: April 17, 2023NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY - SEE PLEADING FOR NAMES & TIME
Date: February 22, 2024REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: May 11, 2023REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: January 23, 2024REQUEST FOR COPIES - REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: December 18, 2023NOTICE OF NON-BINDING ARBITRATION VIA ZOOM - 3/27/24 @10AM
Date: December 28, 2023NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT
Date: July 27, 2023AMENDED DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE OF PLEADINGS
Date: October 10, 2023NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT THE STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: September 26, 2023WITNESS LIST - PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS LIST
Date: October 23, 2023PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT
Date: January 24, 2024ATTORNEY CERTIFICATION
Date: December 15, 2023NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT
Date: August 02, 2023DEFENDANT(S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM NON-PARTY
Date: January 22, 2024INTERROGATORIES AND NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGATORIES
Date: May 10, 2023AMENDED MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE
Date: January 04, 2024REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: April 17, 2023RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: May 10, 2023NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES - TO CINDY HORNBUCKLE
Date: April 17, 2023REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT - THE STANDAR FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: April 17, 2023CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE - CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: January 30, 2024COURT MINUTES
Date: February 08, 2024ORDER REFERRING CASE TO NONBINDING ARBITRATION
Date: September 08, 2023- PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: July 19, 2023NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: June 16, 2023DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: June 16, 2023NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES - TO THE STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: April 17, 2023COURT MINUTES
Date: November 09, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING - 05/07/2024 @ 10:30 AM
Date: March 26, 2024DEFENDANT(S) NOTICE OF PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM NON-PARTY
Date: December 15, 2023MOTION - MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE
Date: March 08, 2024REQUEST FOR COPIES - REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: February 13, 2024ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: May 18, 2023REQUEST FOR COPIES - REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: February 23, 2024CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION - CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION
Date: February 06, 2024NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DISCLOSURE DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: May 18, 2023NOTICE OF FILING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLAINTIFF
Date: January 26, 2024NOTICE OF HEARING - 02/08/2024 @ 09:30 AM
Date: January 09, 2024ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE
Date: February 15, 2024WITNESS LIST - PLAINTIFF'S TRIAL WITNESS LIST
Date: March 21, 2024EXHIBIT LIST -
Date: March 11, 2024MOTION TO COMPEL - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: February 15, 2024CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION - CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION
Date: March 06, 2024SUMMONS REQUEST ISSUED STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE
Date: March 18, 2023STANDING ORDER IN CIRCUIT CIVIL CASES IN THE TWENTIETH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT
Date: March 18, 2023SUMMONS REQUEST ISSUED CINDY HORNBUCKLE
Date: March 18, 2023PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2023018559
Date: March 20, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: March 18, 2023CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 18, 202312/18/2023
Date: April 02, 202412/28/2023
Date: April 01, 20241/30/2024
Date: April 02, 20245/18/2023
Date: April 03, 20244/17/2023
Date: April 02, 20247/13/2023
Date: April 05, 20249/8/2023
Date: April 04, 20244/17/2023
Date: April 06, 20241/23/2024
Date: April 01, 202411/3/2023
Date: April 05, 20243/20/2023
Date: April 01, 20245/10/2023
Date: April 02, 20246/16/2023
Date: April 01, 20245/22/2023
Date: April 01, 20244/17/2023
Date: April 01, 202412/6/2023
Date: April 04, 20247/19/2023
Date: April 05, 20247/19/2023
Date: April 04, 20244/24/2023
Date: April 04, 20241/4/2024
Date: April 02, 202411/9/2023
Date: April 01, 20249/26/2023
Date: April 01, 20241/24/2024
Date: April 01, 20243/18/2023
Date: April 04, 20245/18/2023
Date: April 06, 20246/16/2023
Date: April 11, 202412/5/2023
Date: April 02, 20245/10/2023
Date: April 12, 20246/14/2023
Date: April 03, 20249/7/2023
Date: April 03, 202412/15/2023
Date: April 04, 20247/19/2023
Date: April 01, 20242/8/2024
Date: April 01, 20245/11/2023
Date: April 03, 20245/11/2023
Date: April 01, 20242/6/2024
Date: April 02, 20245/10/2023
Date: April 06, 20244/17/2023
Date: April 04, 20241/22/2024
Date: April 02, 20246/30/2023
Date: April 02, 20245/25/2023
Date: April 01, 202412/7/2023
Date: April 02, 20243/18/2023
Date: April 03, 20243/18/2023
Date: April 02, 202412/15/2023
Date: April 02, 20248/2/2023
Date: April 01, 20247/13/2023
Date: April 23, 20241/9/2024
Date: April 02, 202412/28/2023
Date: April 02, 20247/27/2023
Date: April 01, 20245/22/2023
Date: April 02, 202410/23/2023
Date: April 03, 20245/18/2023
Date: April 02, 20242/6/2024
Date: April 01, 20241/26/2024
Date: April 01, 20245/18/2023
Date: April 01, 20248/23/2023
Date: April 04, 20245/10/2023
Date: April 04, 202410/10/2023
Date: April 01, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.