Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Slipp, Dana, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Popper, Paul, represented by Stewart, Skylar D, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with GENTILE, GEOFFREY H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGENTILE, GEOFFREY H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 18, 2023 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedMarch 15, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
MOTION - DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: February 08, 2024NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING - 02/08/2024 @ 10:30 AM
Date: February 06, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.