Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Krick, Sheila, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Agostino, Angela C, against Reyes, Efren, Techdash Telecom, Llc, represented by Mazuchowski, Susan Kim, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with GENTILE, GEOFFREY H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGENTILE, GEOFFREY H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 18, 2023 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS REQUEST ISSUED EFREN REYES
Date: March 18, 2023PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2023018554
Date: March 20, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: March 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 09, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.