Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Biron, Albert, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Gelinas, Jason W., against Geico, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with GENTILE, GEOFFREY H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGENTILE, GEOFFREY H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 17, 2023 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Albert Biron against GEICO in the Circuit Court of the Twentieth Judicial Circuit in Charlotte County, Florida. The complaint alleges that on December 8, 2022, while Albert Biron was operating his motorcycl...
STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES
Date: March 17, 2023CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 17, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: March 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.