Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Caseau, Jacquelyn, Caseau, Scott, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kassel, Matthew, against First Protective Insurance Company D B A Frontline, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with GENTILE, GEOFFREY H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGENTILE, GEOFFREY H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 18, 131 |
CategoryContracts |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023018467
Date: March 17, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: March 17, 2023CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.