Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Petrolem Marketing Group, Inc, filed a(n) Other - Matters Not Falling Within The Other Civil Subcategories case against Ed Moore Auto Service, Inc, Edward W Moore, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with GENTILE, GEOFFREY H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGENTILE, GEOFFREY H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 17, 2023 |
CategoryOther - Matters Not Falling Within The Other Civil Subcategories |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
|
PAYMENT $442.00 RECEIPT #2023018390
Date: March 17, 20237/14/2023
Date: April 02, 20246/19/2023
Date: April 02, 20246/14/2023
Date: April 05, 20246/5/2023
Date: April 01, 20246/4/2023
Date: April 01, 20243/22/2023
Date: April 01, 20245/18/2023
Date: April 01, 20244/10/2023
Date: April 01, 20243/21/2023
Date: April 07, 20243/21/2023
Date: April 01, 20243/17/2023
Date: April 01, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.