Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) case against Nickerson, Gary Russell Jr, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with CUPP, SCOTT H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCUPP, SCOTT H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 23, 2022 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
|
CITATION COPY
Date: March 24, 2022DECLINE PUBLIC DEFENDER SERVICES
Date: March 24, 2022BOOKING REPORT FILED
Date: March 24, 2022RECORD OF FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING
Date: March 24, 20227/25/2023
Date: April 01, 20248/8/2023
Date: April 01, 20247/18/2023
Date: April 01, 20241/19/2023
Date: April 05, 20243/30/2023
Date: April 01, 20241/13/2023
Date: April 04, 20241/30/2023
Date: April 04, 20241/11/2023
Date: April 06, 20241/12/2023
Date: April 01, 20241/11/2023
Date: April 05, 20241/11/2023
Date: April 03, 202411/22/2022
Date: April 01, 20241/11/2023
Date: April 01, 202411/9/2022
Date: April 01, 202411/9/2022
Date: April 02, 202411/8/2022
Date: April 02, 202411/1/2022
Date: April 01, 20248/17/2022
Date: April 01, 20249/28/2022
Date: April 01, 202410/18/2022
Date: April 02, 202410/14/2022
Date: April 03, 20247/21/2022
Date: April 01, 20248/18/2022
Date: April 01, 20246/8/2022
Date: April 01, 20248/22/2022
Date: April 02, 20247/20/2022
Date: April 01, 20246/7/2022
Date: April 02, 20245/20/2022
Date: April 01, 20247/8/2022
Date: April 01, 20245/17/2022
Date: April 02, 20244/27/2022
Date: April 01, 20244/14/2022
Date: April 05, 20245/16/2022
Date: April 03, 20245/2/2022
Date: April 01, 20244/27/2022
Date: April 02, 20243/24/2022
Date: April 01, 20245/16/2022
Date: April 02, 20243/28/2022
Date: April 01, 20243/24/2022
Date: April 02, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.