Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Rogala, Zachary Richard, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with MCFEE, SHANNON H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMCFEE, SHANNON H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 12, 2022 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Date: March 12, 2022DECLINE PUBLIC DEFENDER SERVICES
Date: March 13, 2022RECORD OF FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING
Date: March 13, 2022BOOKING DOCUMENT
Date: March 12, 2022BOOKING REPORT FILED
Date: March 12, 2022ORDER OF NO CONTACT
Date: March 13, 20224/21/2023
Date: April 01, 20242/1/2023
Date: April 04, 20245/31/2023
Date: April 04, 20245/31/2023
Date: April 01, 20243/1/2023
Date: April 04, 20242/27/2023
Date: April 01, 20242/9/2023
Date: April 02, 20242/1/2023
Date: April 01, 202411/9/2022
Date: April 03, 20241/27/2023
Date: April 02, 20241/27/2023
Date: April 03, 20242/1/2023
Date: April 10, 20241/31/2023
Date: April 01, 20241/28/2023
Date: April 01, 202411/3/2022
Date: April 01, 202410/25/2022
Date: April 01, 20249/21/2022
Date: April 01, 202411/2/2022
Date: April 01, 20248/30/2022
Date: April 01, 20249/20/2022
Date: April 01, 20247/14/2022
Date: April 01, 20246/17/2022
Date: April 01, 20247/26/2022
Date: April 01, 20246/15/2022
Date: April 04, 20246/20/2022
Date: April 02, 20246/9/2022
Date: April 01, 20245/6/2022
Date: April 01, 20246/8/2022
Date: April 01, 20245/5/2022
Date: April 01, 20244/13/2022
Date: April 01, 20244/11/2022
Date: April 01, 20244/12/2022
Date: April 01, 20244/5/2022
Date: April 01, 20244/6/2022
Date: April 01, 20244/5/2022
Date: April 03, 20243/14/2022
Date: April 02, 20243/12/2022
Date: April 05, 20243/13/2022
Date: April 02, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.