Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Kaplan, G Harris filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Patterson, Scott J., against Stefonek, Tiffany Ann, represented by Kaplan, G Harris, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with CUPP, SCOTT H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCUPP, SCOTT H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 06, 2022 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
AFFIDAVIT INDIGENCE GRANTED/ACCEPTED
Date: March 06, 2022RECORD OF FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING
Date: March 06, 2022BOOKING REPORT FILED
Date: March 06, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.