Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bell, Peter A filed a(n) case against Pu Hernandez, Sebastian Israel, represented by Weinberg, Scott, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with BELL, PETER A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBELL, PETER A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
|
BOOKING REPORT FILED
Date: August 27, 2021WAIVER OF APPEARANCE
Date: September 02, 2021BOOKING REPORT RELEASE
Date: September 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT DATE | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | CRIMINAL PRE TRIAL - CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/12/2021 AT 8:30 AM IN 3RD/ , JDG: BELL, PETER A | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENSE ATTORNEY: WEINBERG, SCOTT ASSIGNED | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE PTC 10/12 @ 8:30 - PD WITHRAWN - ATTY WEINBERG ATTY OF RECORD | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | PROSECUTOR: DEMING, NOLAN M ASSIGNED | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AF1NAHE | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION AND NOTICE TO CLERK | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | FILED SEQ: 1 SAME - (322.03 1) OPERATE MOTOR VEHICLE W/O VALID DRIVER'S LICENSE 467 | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | BOOKING REPORT RELEASE | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | CASH APPEARANCE BOND |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.