Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Concilio, Brian filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Sorenson, Caitlin E., against Devary, Tajuana Marie, represented by Concilio, Brian, Speyer, Erin, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with PORTER, LISA S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePORTER, LISA S Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 05, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
RECORD OF FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING
Date: September 07, 2021BOOKING REPORT FILED
Date: September 05, 2021AFFIDAVIT INDIGENCE GRANTED/ACCEPTED
Date: September 06, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
February 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
February 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
February 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
February 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
February 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.