Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Cupp, Scott H filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Reyes, Ignacio A, represented by Kaplan, G Harris, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with CUPP, SCOTT H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCUPP, SCOTT H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
AFFIDAVIT INDIGENCE GRANTED/ACCEPTED
Date: August 28, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: September 02, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE AMENDED
Date: September 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2022 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS - PD APPT'D | |
January 22, 2022 | Docket Event | CRIMINAL FIRST APPEARANCE SET FOR 01/22/2022 AT 8:30 AM IN 4TH/ , JDG: GENTILE, GEOFFREY H | |
January 22, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR COURT APPOINTED INTERPRETER | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | BENCH WARRANT SERVED | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | JESSICA LUNSFORD CERTIFICATE | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | BOOKING REPORT FILED | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | HABITUAL FELONY OFFENDER STATUS | |
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER TO TRANSPORT | |
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.