Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Clough, Casey filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Cortez, Victor Delin, represented by Clough, Casey, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with MASON, DONALD H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMASON, DONALD H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 27, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
AFFIDAVIT INDIGENCE GRANTED/ACCEPTED
Date: August 28, 2021BOOKING REPORT FILED
Date: August 27, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Date: August 27, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | PLEA OF GUILTY OR NO CONTEST | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | FINGERPRINTS OF DEFENDANT | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE PLEA ENETERED | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | SENTENCE FORM @ | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | SENTENCING GUIDELINES SCORESHEET | |
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event | PROSECUTOR: DETZEL, TRACY L. ASSIGNED | |
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event | FILED SEQ: 2 SAME - (812.014 2C1) GRAND THEFT - VALUE $300 OR MORE BUT L/T $5,000 | |
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event | INFORMATION AND NOTICE TO CLERK - EXPEDITED | |
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event | FILED SEQ: 1 SAME - (581.185) HARVEST ENDANGERED PLANT WO PERM 2179 | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.