Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bell, Peter A filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Papa, Lonny June, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with BELL, PETER A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBELL, PETER A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 06, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
9/6/2021
Date: November 03, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING SUPERVISED RELEASE ON RECOGNIZANCE | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/WVR OF ARRGN/WRTTN PLEA/DMD DISC | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | RECORD OF FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT INDIGENCE GRANTED/ACCEPTED | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | CRIMINAL FIRST APPEARANCE SET FOR 09/07/2021 AT 8:30 AM IN 4TH/ , JDG: GENTILE, GEOFFREY H | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | PUBLIC DEF APP FEE MISD $50 ASSESSED $50.00 DUE ON 9/14/2021 | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER ASSIGNED | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGE BELL, PETER A: ASSIGNED | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF NO CONTACT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.