Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bell, Peter A filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Mishou, Gary J Jr, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with BELL, PETER A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBELL, PETER A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 06, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
October 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
September 06, 2021 | Docket Event | BOOKING REPORT FILED | |
September 06, 2021 | Docket Event | CRIMINAL ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 09/22/2021 AT 8:30 AM IN 3RD/ , JDG: BELL, PETER A | |
September 06, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGE BELL, PETER A: ASSIGNED | |
September 06, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 09/06/2021 CASE NUMBER 21001185M | |
September 06, 2021 | Docket Event | JESSICA LUNSFORD CERTIFICATE | |
September 06, 2021 | Docket Event | CRIMINAL FIRST APPEARANCE SET FOR 09/06/2021 AT 8:30 AM IN 4TH/ , JDG: GENTILE, GEOFFREY H | |
September 06, 2021 | Docket Event | HABITUAL FELONY OFFENDER STATUS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.