Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bell, Peter A filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Rutkowski, John P Jr, Soja, Garrick N., against Shaffer, William Benjamin, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with BELL, PETER A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBELL, PETER A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 05, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
BOOKING REPORT FILED
Date: September 05, 2021SURETY APPEARANCE BOND
Date: September 07, 2021INFORMATION AND NOTICE TO CLERK
Date: September 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.