Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bell, Peter A filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Williams, Keshaun Michael, represented by Lewis, Amaris A, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with BELL, PETER A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBELL, PETER A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 04, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
NOTICE OF DISCOVERY
Date: September 23, 2021INFORMATION AND NOTICE TO CLERK
Date: September 20, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE AMENDED
Date: September 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.