Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Burns, John L filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Kinsey, Austin James Jr, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with BURNS, JOHN L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBURNS, JOHN L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 04, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: September 29, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY
Date: September 27, 2021COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE CMC 10/25 @ 9AM
Date: September 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.