Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bell, Peter A filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Tyree, Daren James, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with BELL, PETER A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBELL, PETER A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
BOOKING REPORT FILED
Date: September 01, 2021RECORD OF FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING
Date: September 02, 2021DECLINE PUBLIC DEFENDER SERVICES - REFUSED INTERVIEW
Date: September 02, 2021RECORD OF FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING
Date: September 03, 20219/6/2021
Date: April 01, 20249/17/2021
Date: April 01, 20249/4/2021
Date: April 01, 20249/2/2021
Date: April 01, 20249/3/2021
Date: April 01, 20249/1/2021
Date: April 02, 20249/1/2021
Date: April 01, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
September 04, 2021 | Docket Event | RECORD OF FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | RECORD OF FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | CRIMINAL ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 09/22/2021 AT 8:30 AM IN 3RD/ , JDG: BELL, PETER A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.