Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Burns, John L filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Emery, Travis Scott, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with BURNS, JOHN L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBURNS, JOHN L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 27, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
AFFIDAVIT INDIGENCE GRANTED/ACCEPTED
Date: August 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Date: August 27, 2021RECORD OF FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING
Date: August 28, 2021SURETY APPEARANCE BOND
Date: August 30, 2021COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE - MOTION TO REVOKE BONDS GRANTED - NO BOND HOLD
Date: September 04, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/WVR OF ARRGN/WRTTN PLEA/DMD DISC
Date: September 02, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE AMENDED
Date: August 31, 2021BOOKING REPORT RELEASE
Date: August 30, 2021ORDER OF NO CONTACT - INFORMATION FORWARDED FROM SAO
Date: August 30, 2021ORDER OF NO CONTACT
Date: August 28, 2021BOOKING REPORT FILED
Date: August 27, 2021BOND DISCHARGE SLIP
Date: September 05, 20219/17/2021
Date: April 01, 20249/28/2021
Date: April 02, 20249/5/2021
Date: April 01, 20249/15/2021
Date: April 01, 20249/28/2021
Date: April 01, 20248/30/2021
Date: April 02, 20248/31/2021
Date: April 01, 20249/2/2021
Date: April 01, 20248/28/2021
Date: April 02, 20248/28/2021
Date: April 01, 20249/4/2021
Date: April 01, 20248/27/2021
Date: April 02, 20248/29/2021
Date: April 02, 20248/27/2021
Date: April 04, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.