Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bogle, Tauna Ren filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Patterson, Scott J., against Rogers, Daniel Paul, represented by Kaplan, G Harris, Napolitan, Katelyn, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with CUPP, SCOTT H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCUPP, SCOTT H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 13, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
AFFIDAVIT INDIGENCE GRANTED/ACCEPTED
Date: June 13, 2021ORDER OF NO CONTACT
Date: June 13, 2021INFORMATION AND NOTICE TO CLERK - STANDARD
Date: July 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.