Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cupp, Scott H filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Tello Vasquez, Hector, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with CUPP, SCOTT H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCUPP, SCOTT H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 13, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
AFFIDAVIT INDIGENCE GRANTED/ACCEPTED
Date: June 13, 20218/25/2021
Date: April 01, 20248/23/2021
Date: April 01, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.