Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Mason, Donald H filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Jackson, Montel De Marqus, Mason, Christopher Alan, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with MASON, DONALD H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMASON, DONALD H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 13, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
AFFIDAVIT INDIGENCE GRANTED/ACCEPTED
Date: June 13, 2021SURETY BOND PC701468800 POSTED $5,000.00
Date: June 16, 2021CITATION (TICKET)
Date: June 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.