Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Cupp, Scott H filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Shaffer, Derek Albert, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with CUPP, SCOTT H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCUPP, SCOTT H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 12, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
INFORMATION AND NOTICE TO CLERK - EXPEDITED
Date: June 29, 2021WAIVER OF APPEARANCE
Date: June 16, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: June 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 09, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 09, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.