Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Colombo, Michael Jr filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Reynolds, Casey Woodrow, represented by Kaplan, G Harris, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with CUPP, SCOTT H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCUPP, SCOTT H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 10, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
BOOKING REPORT FILED
Date: June 10, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Date: June 10, 20218/5/2021
Date: January 02, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE CMC 9/9 9AM | |
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.