Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Concilio, Brian filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Sorenson, Caitlin E., against Didonato, Matthew David, represented by Concilio, Brian, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with MASON, DONALD H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMASON, DONALD H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 04, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: November 02, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)
Date: September 27, 2021VIOLATION REPORT (2ND ADDENDUM)
Date: December 13, 2022NOTICE OF DISCOVERY
Date: December 21, 2022COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE PLEA ENTERED
Date: January 26, 2023JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE FILED
Date: February 07, 2023ORDER OF REVOCATION OF PROBATION
Date: May 02, 2023PARTIAL PAYMENT AGREEMENT
Date: January 25, 2024ENVELOPE
Date: April 16, 2024PAYMENT $25.00 RECEIPT #2024014274
Date: January 25, 2024NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: September 17, 2021ENVELOPE
Date: February 23, 2024VIOLATION PLEA FORM
Date: February 07, 2023PARTIAL PAYMENT AGREEMENT - MAILED IN
Date: January 25, 2024NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: October 21, 2021NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 24, 2021CREDIT TIME SERVED FORM 91 DAYS
Date: January 30, 2023RECORD OF FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING
Date: November 04, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF VIOLATION OF PROBATION ( 2ND AMENDED)
Date: December 13, 2022JUDGMENT OF GUILT & PLACING DEF ON PROBATION
Date: January 31, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE - WARRANTLESS
Date: October 30, 2022PAYMENT $500.00 RECEIPT #2024018217
Date: February 23, 2024DEF'S MOTION AND NOTICE OF HEARING 11/4 @ 1:30
Date: October 21, 2022VIOLATION REPORT
Date: November 01, 2022PAYMENT $100.00 RECEIPT #2024026002
Date: April 16, 2024BOOKING REPORT FILED
Date: November 03, 2022SENTENCE FORM - VOP R.T
Date: January 26, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/WVR OF ARRGN/WRTTN PLEA/DMD DISC
Date: November 04, 2022FINGERPRINTS OF DEFENDANT
Date: February 07, 2023ENVELOPE
Date: January 25, 2024ENVELOPE
Date: March 18, 2024VIOLATION OF PROBATION WARRANT ISSUED
Date: November 01, 2022SURETY BOND 2021-AA-035954 POSTED $3,500.00
Date: June 07, 2021SENTENCE FORM - CT 1,3 &4 ADJ GUILTY, CT2 NOLLE PROS
Date: December 28, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/WVR OF ARRGN/WRTTN PLEA/DMD DISC
Date: June 07, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: June 22, 2021PLEA OF GUILTY OR NO CONTEST
Date: December 28, 2021COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE CMC 9/15 1:30
Date: July 12, 2021COURT ORDER REPORT OF DISPOSITION
Date: January 10, 2022RECORD OF FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING
Date: October 30, 2022CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - PTC 10/19 9:00
Date: September 15, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: November 24, 2021NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 18, 2021CREDIT TIME SERVED FORM 1 DAY
Date: January 10, 2022CASE CORRESPONDENCE - INFO FR DOC WEBSITE
Date: October 30, 2022SENTENCING GUIDELINES SCORESHEET
Date: January 26, 2023COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE VOP HR 1/26 @ 9AM
Date: December 22, 2022AFFIDAVIT INDIGENCE GRANTED/ACCEPTED
Date: November 03, 2022BOOKING REPORT FILED
Date: October 30, 2022RECORD OF FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING
Date: November 03, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Date: November 03, 2022DEF'S MOTION FOR EARLY RELEASE FROM PROBATION
Date: October 21, 2022COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE - VOP HRG 12/22 9:00
Date: December 05, 2022COPY OF DRIVER'S LICENSE
Date: January 25, 2024PAYMENT $100.00 RECEIPT #2024021758
Date: March 18, 2024AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Date: June 04, 2021AFFIDAVIT INDIGENCE GRANTED/ACCEPTED
Date: June 04, 2021BOOKING REPORT RELEASE
Date: June 07, 2021INFORMATION AND NOTICE TO CLERK - STANDARD
Date: July 07, 2021SURETY BOND 2021-AA-035955 POSTED $2,500.00
Date: June 07, 2021PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER PTC 12/28 @ 9AM
Date: November 22, 2021ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: July 12, 2021BOOKING REPORT FILED
Date: June 04, 2021RECORD OF FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING
Date: June 04, 2021SURETY BOND 2021-AA-035956 POSTED $1,500.00
Date: June 07, 2021SURETY BOND 2021-AA-035953 POSTED $3,500.00
Date: June 07, 2021PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER PLEA ENTERED CT 1 N/C / CT 2 N/P / CT 3&4 A/G
Date: December 28, 2021PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER PTC 11/22 @ 9AM
Date: October 19, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: November 10, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY
Date: July 09, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: July 15, 2021FINGERPRINTS OF DEFENDANT
Date: December 28, 2021JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE FILED
Date: March 04, 2022BOND DISCHARGE SLIP
Date: January 10, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF VIOLATION OF PROBATION
Date: November 01, 2022SENTENCING GUIDELINES SCORESHEET
Date: December 28, 2021DECLINE PUBLIC DEFENDER SERVICES - DEFENDANT UNAVAILABLE
Date: October 30, 2022VIOLATION OF PROBATION WARRANT SERVED
Date: November 03, 202212/28/2021
Date: April 06, 20241/31/2022
Date: April 03, 202411/1/2022
Date: April 05, 20246/22/2021
Date: April 01, 20247/9/2021
Date: April 01, 20247/12/2021
Date: April 01, 202411/10/2021
Date: April 01, 202410/21/2022
Date: April 01, 202410/30/2022
Date: April 03, 202410/30/2022
Date: April 01, 20246/7/2021
Date: April 02, 20247/7/2021
Date: April 04, 20243/4/2022
Date: April 06, 202411/2/2021
Date: April 01, 202412/28/2021
Date: April 01, 20241/10/2022
Date: April 03, 202411/24/2021
Date: April 01, 202410/30/2022
Date: April 02, 202412/5/2022
Date: April 01, 20246/4/2021
Date: April 01, 20242/7/2023
Date: April 01, 20242/23/2024
Date: April 01, 20246/4/2021
Date: April 02, 20246/7/2021
Date: April 03, 202411/4/2022
Date: April 01, 202411/1/2022
Date: April 02, 202412/13/2022
Date: April 10, 20242/7/2023
Date: April 05, 20246/4/2021
Date: April 04, 20246/7/2021
Date: April 01, 202410/21/2021
Date: April 01, 20249/27/2021
Date: April 01, 202411/3/2022
Date: April 03, 202411/1/2022
Date: April 01, 20242/7/2023
Date: April 02, 202412/28/2021
Date: April 04, 20241/25/2024
Date: April 01, 202411/3/2022
Date: April 02, 202412/21/2022
Date: April 01, 202412/22/2022
Date: April 01, 20241/26/2023
Date: April 01, 20242/7/2023
Date: April 04, 20245/2/2023
Date: April 02, 202412/13/2022
Date: April 01, 202411/18/2021
Date: April 01, 202411/22/2021
Date: April 01, 202412/28/2021
Date: April 03, 202411/3/2022
Date: April 01, 20241/26/2023
Date: April 04, 20241/30/2023
Date: April 01, 20249/17/2021
Date: April 01, 20241/10/2022
Date: April 01, 20249/15/2021
Date: April 01, 20247/15/2021
Date: April 01, 202410/19/2021
Date: April 01, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | ENVELOPE | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $100.00 RECEIPT #2024026002 | |
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.