Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Eggleton, Colin J filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Bowman, Sean Michael, represented by Mcdonald, Patrick W., in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with MASON, DONALD H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMASON, DONALD H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 02, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
BOOKING REPORT FILED
Date: June 02, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Date: June 02, 2021COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE CMC 8/11 9AM
Date: July 12, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/WVR OF ARRGN/WRTTN PLEA/DMD DISC
Date: June 09, 2021INFORMATION AND NOTICE TO CLERK - STANDARD
Date: June 29, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY
Date: June 30, 2021RECORD OF FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING
Date: June 03, 20218/18/2021
Date: April 01, 202410/27/2022
Date: April 01, 20248/13/2021
Date: April 01, 202410/28/2022
Date: April 01, 202410/5/2021
Date: April 07, 20248/13/2021
Date: April 06, 20248/11/2021
Date: April 01, 20248/11/2021
Date: April 06, 20247/12/2021
Date: April 01, 20248/11/2021
Date: April 03, 20248/6/2021
Date: April 01, 20246/9/2021
Date: April 01, 20247/15/2021
Date: April 01, 20246/3/2021
Date: April 02, 20246/30/2021
Date: April 01, 20246/2/2021
Date: April 05, 20246/29/2021
Date: April 04, 20246/3/2021
Date: April 01, 20246/2/2021
Date: April 04, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.