Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Colombo, Michael Jr filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Waterous, Todd Michael, represented by Powell, Michael G, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with MCFEE, SHANNON H presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMCFEE, SHANNON H Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 01, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
ORDER OF NO CONTACT
Date: June 01, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Date: June 01, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/WVR OF ARRGN/WRTTN PLEA/DMD DISC
Date: June 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.