Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Burns, John L filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Howard, Tiffany Marie, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with BURNS, JOHN L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBURNS, JOHN L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 06, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
BOOKING REPORT FILED
Date: June 06, 2021INFORMATION AND NOTICE TO CLERK
Date: June 16, 2021SURETY BOND 2021AA35915 POSTED $1,500.00
Date: June 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.