Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Burns, John L filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Adams, William Scott Jr, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with BURNS, JOHN L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBURNS, JOHN L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 06, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
RECORD OF FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING
Date: June 07, 2021AFFIDAVIT INDIGENCE GRANTED/ACCEPTED FEE ASSESSED IN CASE 201928T
Date: June 07, 2021BOOKING REPORT FILED
Date: June 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.