Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Burns, John L filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Leslie, Alexander Bruce, represented by Rizzo, Annemarie Rose, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with BURNS, JOHN L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBURNS, JOHN L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 30, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
CITATION (TICKET)
Date: May 30, 2021RETURNED MAIL
Date: June 21, 2021CITATION (TICKET) (2 COPIES SUBMITTED)
Date: June 11, 2021SURETY BOND AS3K467809 POSTED $1,000.00
Date: June 01, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY
Date: June 21, 2021WAIVER OF APPEARANCE
Date: June 02, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: June 02, 2021BOOKING REPORT FILED
Date: May 30, 2021INFORMATION AND NOTICE TO CLERK
Date: June 21, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: June 17, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: June 04, 2021BOOKING REPORT RELEASE
Date: June 01, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)
Date: July 20, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: June 21, 2021SUBPOENA RETURNED EXECUTED
Date: July 01, 2021COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE - CMC 08/02 @ 9AM
Date: June 23, 2021RECORD OF FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING
Date: May 30, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)
Date: July 23, 2021DECLINE PUBLIC DEFENDER SERVICES-TO HIRE PRIVATE ATTY
Date: May 30, 2021SUBPOENA RETURNED EXECUTED
Date: July 16, 2021ROR WORKSHEET
Date: May 30, 2021SUBPOENA RETURNED EXECUTED
Date: September 24, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: August 06, 2021COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE CMC 9/27 @ 9AM
Date: August 02, 2021RETURNED MAIL
Date: August 16, 20216/9/2022
Date: April 01, 202412/7/2021
Date: April 02, 202411/23/2021
Date: April 01, 20243/16/2022
Date: April 01, 20241/10/2022
Date: April 01, 202411/29/2021
Date: April 01, 20246/9/2022
Date: April 02, 202411/16/2021
Date: April 01, 202411/12/2021
Date: April 01, 202410/27/2021
Date: April 04, 202410/27/2021
Date: April 03, 20249/29/2021
Date: April 01, 20249/27/2021
Date: April 01, 20248/6/2021
Date: April 01, 20247/20/2021
Date: April 01, 20248/2/2021
Date: April 01, 20247/23/2021
Date: April 01, 20248/16/2021
Date: April 02, 20247/16/2021
Date: April 01, 20249/24/2021
Date: April 01, 20247/1/2021
Date: April 01, 20246/23/2021
Date: April 01, 20246/21/2021
Date: April 05, 20246/21/2021
Date: April 02, 20246/21/2021
Date: April 01, 20246/21/2021
Date: April 04, 20246/17/2021
Date: April 01, 20246/11/2021
Date: April 02, 20246/4/2021
Date: April 01, 20246/1/2021
Date: April 02, 20246/2/2021
Date: April 02, 20246/2/2021
Date: April 01, 20245/30/2021
Date: April 01, 20245/30/2021
Date: April 02, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.