Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against King, Sean Steven, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with Donald H. Mason presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonald H. Mason Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryOut Of County |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
BOOKING REPORT FILED
Date: September 03, 2021AFFIDAVIT INDIGENCE GRANTED/ACCEPTED
Date: September 03, 2021RECORD OF FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING
Date: September 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | BOOKING REPORT FILED | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT INDIGENCE GRANTED/ACCEPTED | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | RECORD OF FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 09/03/2021 CASE NUMBER 21001653F | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | CRIMINAL ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 10/11/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 4TH/ , JDG: CUPP, SCOTT H | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 09/03/2021 CASE NUMBER 21000343O | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | CRIMINAL FIRST APPEARANCE SET FOR 09/03/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 3RD/ , JDG: ALESSANDRONI, PAUL | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.