Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Alessandroni, Paul filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Pai, Gabriella Grace, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts with ALESSANDRONI, PAUL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeALESSANDRONI, PAUL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 17, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE
Date: February 17, 2021BOOKING REPORT FILED
Date: February 17, 2021DECLINE PUBLIC DEFENDER SERVICES
Date: February 17, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: March 02, 2021INFORMATION AND NOTICE TO CLERK - EXPEDITED
Date: March 16, 2021SURETY BOND PC701457363 POSTED $1,500.00
Date: March 02, 2021SURETY BOND PC701457365 POSTED $2,500.00
Date: March 02, 2021SURETY BOND PC701457364 POSTED $2,500.00
Date: March 02, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/WRTTN PLEA/DMD JURY TRL
Date: March 24, 2021RECORD OF FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING
Date: February 17, 2021BOOKING REPORT RELEASE
Date: February 19, 2021COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE - CMC 4/15 9:00
Date: March 29, 2021WAIVER OF APPEARANCE
Date: March 25, 2021DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY
Date: March 24, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE AMENDED
Date: March 24, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: April 22, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY
Date: April 15, 2021CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER CMC 5/20 9AM
Date: April 15, 2021CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER CMC 6/24 9AM
Date: May 20, 2021CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER 7/29 @ 9AM
Date: June 24, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: March 30, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: May 29, 2021CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER P.S 8/27 1:30
Date: July 29, 2021SENTENCE FORM @
Date: August 27, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: August 02, 2021COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE NOLO CONTENDERE & NP
Date: August 27, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)
Date: June 29, 2021SENTENCING GUIDELINES SCORESHEET
Date: August 27, 2021PLEA OF GUILTY OR NO CONTEST
Date: August 27, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: June 26, 2021DECLINE PUBLIC DEFENDER SERVICES
Date: September 27, 2021WIDMAN WARRANT SERVED
Date: September 27, 2021BOOKING REPORT FILED
Date: September 27, 2021ORDER W/HOLDING ADJ OF GUILT & PLACING DEF ON PROB
Date: September 08, 2021SENTENCE FORM - CT1 ADJ WITHHELD, CT2 NP, CT 3 ADJ GUILTY
Date: August 27, 2021WIDMAN WARRANT ISSUED
Date: October 01, 2021VIOLATION REPORT
Date: September 28, 2021RECORD OF FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING
Date: September 27, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF VIOLATION OF PROBATION
Date: September 28, 2021WIDMAN WARRANT ISSUED
Date: September 26, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/WRTTN PLEA NOT GUILTY
Date: October 05, 2021JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE FILED
Date: October 04, 2021COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE VOP HRG 11/12 @ 130PM
Date: October 11, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: October 12, 2021RECORD OF FIRST APPEARANCE HEARING
Date: October 02, 2021WIDMAN WARRANT SERVED
Date: October 02, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF VIOLATION OF PROBATION (AMENDED)
Date: October 05, 2021NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: October 05, 2021DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY
Date: October 05, 2021WAIVER OF APPEARANCE
Date: October 07, 2021VIOLATION REPORT ADDENDUM
Date: October 05, 2021SENTENCE FORM DISMISSED
Date: November 12, 2021CREDIT TIME SERVED FORM 3 DAYS
Date: September 07, 2021BOND DISCHARGE SLIP
Date: September 07, 2021FINGERPRINTS OF DEFENDANT
Date: August 27, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | SENTENCE FORM DISMISSED | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT DATE | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | CRIMINAL VOP HEARING SET FOR 11/12/2021 AT 1:30 PM IN 4TH/ , JDG: CUPP, SCOTT H | |
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT ORDER/NOTICE/MINUTE VOP HRG 11/12 @ 130PM | |
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF APPEARANCE | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/WRTTN PLEA NOT GUILTY | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF VIOLATION OF PROBATION (AMENDED) | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT DATE | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | VIOLATION REPORT ADDENDUM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.